+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/25/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 22 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor