+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0301'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 02:14 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 10:26 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:11 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 608 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-2) concurred in
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 496 Yeas 102 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Amended
- Read a third time
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/22/2019
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 269 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator ruth johnson
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor