+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0249'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/26/2013 @ 4:03 pm
- Approved by governor 12/20/2013 @ 10:22 am
- Presented to governor 12/18/2013 @ 2:16 pm 2013 addenda
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 482 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/05/2013
On November 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 487 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on outdoor recreation and tourism
- Introduced by senator goeffrey hansen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor