+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- POCKET VETO 01/05/2021
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 11:50 am
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Roll call: roll call # 616 yeas 21 nays 16 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-6) concurred in
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) not adopted
- Substitute (H-6) adopted
- Read a second time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 626 Yeas 60 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
- Title amended
- Returned to Senate
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 83 yeas 21 nays 16 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 02/26/2020
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor