+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0241'13
- Filed with secretary of state 12/26/2013 @ 3:47 pm
- Approved by governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:22 pm
- Presented to governor 12/18/2013 @ 10:36 am 2013 addenda
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 471 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/14/2013
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 544 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
- Introduced by senator randy richardville