+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 288 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor