+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0022'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 01/31/2020 02:58 pm
- Approved by governor 01/31/2020 02:18 pm
- Presented to governor 01/30/2020 01:44 pm
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/11/2019
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 374 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
- Introduced by senator lana theis
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor