+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/22/2020
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 317 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator erika geiss
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor