+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0063'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/14/2018 @ 1:14 pm
- Approved by governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:48 am
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 3/1/2018 @ 2:01 pm
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 79 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/12/2017
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 516 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor