+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0256'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/30/2014 @ 2:42 pm
- Approved by governor 6/28/2014 @ 8:44 am
- Presented to governor 6/25/2014 @ 3:32 pm
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 414 Yeas 96 Nays 14
- Read a third time
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/18/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 106 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator david hildenbrand
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor