+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0209'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/23/2013 @ 4:46 pm
- Approved by governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:18 pm
- Presented to governor 12/18/2013 @ 10:46 am 2013 addenda
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/04/2013
On December 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 549 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On December 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on insurance
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator goeffrey hansen