+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Judiciary
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/06/2014
On November 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 643 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor