+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0142'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 07/14/2020 10:34 am
- Approved by governor 07/13/2020 01:48 pm
- Presented to governor 06/30/2020 11:03 am
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 266 Yeas 99 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/20/2020
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 149 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-3)
- Substitute (s-3) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-3)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-3)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-3)
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Introduced by senator john bizon, m.d.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor