+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0215'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/26/2018 @ 1:40 pm
- Approved by governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:56 pm
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:04 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 541 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 345 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Vote reconsidered
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Received on 05/23/2018
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor