+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/27/2016 @ 2:24 PM
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 834 yeas 33 nays 3 excused 1 not voting 1
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 715 Yeas 69 Nays 39
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/16/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 111 yeas 36 nays 2 excused 0 not voting 0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor