+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 425 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Received on 10/19/2017
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
- Introduced by senator david knezek
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor