+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0261'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/23/2015 @ 2:58 pm
- Approved by governor 12/23/2015 @ 9:20 am
- Presented to governor 12/22/2015 @ 1:22 pm 2015 addenda
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 105 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/03/2015
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 548 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
- Introduced by senator wayne schmidt
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor