+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0315'20
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 10:54 AM
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 02:42 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/21/2020 12:22 pm
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Roll call: roll call # 557 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-1) concurred in
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a third time
- Postponed temporarily
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 520 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 319 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 09/22/2020
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2) as amended
- Substitute (s-2) as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2) and amendment(s)
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor