+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0273'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 7/2/2014 @ 11:29 am
- Approved by governor 6/24/2014 @ 5:12 pm
- Presented to governor 6/19/2014 @ 3:18 pm
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 465 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- House inserted full title
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 393 Yeas 88 Nays 22
- Read a third time
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/31/2013
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 483 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development
- Introduced by senator michael kowall
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor