+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/26/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 147 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator bruce caswell
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor