+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/27/2016 @ 1:50 PM
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 660 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/10/2016
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 256 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor