+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0097'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 4/3/2014 @ 3:26 pm
- Approved by governor 4/3/2014 @ 11:20 am
- Presented to governor 3/27/2014 @ 1:42 pm
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 122 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-3 concurred in
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- House amended title
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 118 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-3 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/07/2013
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 496 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on reforms, restructuring and reinventing
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor