+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/21/2016
On September 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 523 yeas 24 nays 10 excused 2 not voting 1
- Amendment(s) defeated
On September 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor