+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0046'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/6/2013 @ 12:54 pm
- Approved by governor 6/5/2013 @ 1:06 pm
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/3/2013 @ 11:22 am
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed for the day
- House inserted full title
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 89 Nays 18
- Read a third time
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/12/2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 19 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources, environment and great lakes
- Introduced by senator arlan meekhof
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor