+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0126'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 5/20/2014 @ 3:56 pm
- Approved by governor 5/20/2014 @ 11:23 am
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 5/15/2014 @ 2:24 pm
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 248 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-4 concurred in
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- House amended title
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/12/2013
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 506 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker