+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0029'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/8/2016 @ 2:02 pm
- Approved by governor 3/8/2016 @ 10:24 am
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 2/29/2016 @ 2:28 pm
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 104 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/10/2015
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 584 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor