+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0019'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 2/14/2018 @ 1:44 pm
- Approved by governor 2/14/2018 @ 12:28 pm
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 2/6/2018 @ 2:06 pm
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/02/2017
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 441 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On November 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator margaret o'brien
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor