+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0234'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/22/2015 @ 3:24 pm
- Approved by governor 12/22/2015 @ 10:08 am
- Presented to governor 12/21/2015 @ 11:01 am 2015 addenda
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 621 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 97 Nays 9
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
On October 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received on 10/15/2015
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 439 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator john proos