+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0233'15 with immediate effect
- Presented to governor 12/21/2015 @ 10:59 am 2015 addenda
- Filed with secretary of state 12/22/2015 @ 3:22 pm
- Approved by governor 12/22/2015 @ 10:06 am
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 620 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 1
- Vote reconsidered
- Roll call # 619 yeas 34 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 3
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 478 Yeas 100 Nays 6
- Read a third time
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted and amended
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
On October 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received on 10/15/2015
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 438 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor