+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0382'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/17/2014 @ 4:06 pm
- Approved by governor 12/17/2014 @ 11:30 am
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/15/2014 @ 2:30 pm
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 731 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 605 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/20/2014
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 44 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On September 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator bruce caswell
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor