+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0011'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 01/27/2020 03:14 pm
- Approved by governor 01/24/2020 10:51 am
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 01/14/2020 10:42 am
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor