+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government and Municipal Finance
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/09/2022
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 18 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
- Introduced by senator paul wojno