+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0175'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 11/21/2017 @ 3:44 pm
- Approved by governor 11/20/2017 @ 11:22 am
- Presented to governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:48 pm
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 389 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/03/2017
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 354 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator darwin booher
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor