+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Received on 01/28/2020
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 26 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator michael d. macdonald
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor