+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0254'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/23/2015 @ 2:44 pm
- Approved by governor 12/23/2015 @ 9:34 am
- Presented to governor 12/22/2015 @ 1:32 pm 2015 addenda
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 637 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 100 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/10/2015
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Passed roll call # 521 yeas 31 nays 5 excused 2 not voting 0
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator judith emmons
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor