+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0021'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 2/23/2016 @ 4:10 pm
- Approved by governor 2/23/2016 @ 3:33 pm
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 2/12/2016 @ 10:06 am
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 29 Yeas 105 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/08/2015
On December 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 552 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor