+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0071'21 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 07/29/2021 09:36 am
- Filed with secretary of state 07/29/2021 11:10 am
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 07/21/2021 10:48 am
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 328 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-5) concurred in
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-5) adopted
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 413 Yeas 95 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Title amended
- Returned to Senate
- Read a third time
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Received on 06/10/2021
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 261 yeas 25 nays 10 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
- Introduced by senator kevin daley
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor