+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0047'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/25/2014 @ 4:16 pm
- Approved by governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:42 pm
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 3/19/2014 @ 2:28 pm
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 97 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-6 concurred in
- House inserted full title
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 96 Yeas 103 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-6 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-6
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 499 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 1
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received on 11/07/2013
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On September 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator joe hune
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor