+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/05/2015
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 501 yeas 27 nays 11 excused 0 not voting 0
- Vote reconsidered
- Passed roll call # 490 yeas 30 nays 8 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator phillip pavlov