+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed for the day
- Vetoed by governor 07/02/2014
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/25/2014 @ 3:36 pm
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 61 Nays 49
- Read a third time
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/13/2014
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Passed roll call # 258 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
- Substitute s-1 adopted
On October 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator mark jansen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor