+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0052'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/6/2018 @ 3:48 pm
- Approved by governor 3/6/2018 @ 11:24 am
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 2/22/2018 @ 2:17 pm
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 57 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 45 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Amended
- Read a third time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/13/2017
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 560 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor