+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0185'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 12/13/2013 @ 1:06 pm
- Presented to governor 12/13/2013 @ 11:54 am 2013 addenda
- Filed with secretary of state 12/13/2013 @ 4:24 pm
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call # 659 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House inserted full title
- Amendment(s) adopted
- House substitute h-3 concurred in as amended
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 495 Yeas 76 Nays 33
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-returned from Senate with substitute H-3 to House substitute [%] with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate amendment(s) to House substitute H-3 concurred in
- Roll Call # 533 Yeas 77 Nays 32
- Re-returned to Senate
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
On October 30, 2013 in the House:
- Received on 10/30/2013
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 477 yeas 27 nays 10 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator james marleau
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor