+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0058'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/14/2018 @ 1:04 pm
- Approved by governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:50 am
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 3/1/2018 @ 2:03 pm
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 97 yeas 34 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 1
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed Roll Call # 86 Yeas 104 Nays 4
- Vote reconsidered
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 83 Yeas 102 Nays 6
- Read a third time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/30/2017
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 466 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator judith emmons
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor