+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0150'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/11/2014 @ 3:52 pm
- Approved by governor 6/11/2014 @ 12:08 pm
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/4/2014 @ 11:45 am
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 317 Yeas 107 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/15/2013
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 402 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance
- Introduced by senator joe hune