+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0312'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 02:36 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 10:48 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/21/2020 04:18 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 579 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/02/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 155 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Introduced by senator michael d. macdonald
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor