+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/19/2013
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 301 yeas 21 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator jack brandenburg