+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0014'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 2/16/2016 @ 2:50 pm
- Approved by governor 2/16/2016 @ 8:28 am
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 2/5/2016 @ 1:21 pm
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 16 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 73 Nays 34
- Read a third time
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/05/2015
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 493 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
- Introduced by senator david robertson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor