+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 31, 2022 in the House:
- POCKET VETO 01/11/2023
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/28/2022 02:32 PM
On December 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 493 Yeas 88 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 12
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 240 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 1
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received on 05/19/2022
- Read a first time
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator roger victory
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor