+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 197'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/13/2017 @ 1:06 pm
- Approved by governor 12/13/2017 @ 11:10 am
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/6/2017 @ 3:37 pm
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 413 Yeas 94 Nays 13
- Read a third time
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Per Rule 41 referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/19/2017
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 410 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Substitute s-1 adopted
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor