+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0103'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 7/3/2013 @ 11:50 am
- Filed with secretary of state 7/3/2013 @ 4:17 pm
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/26/2013 @ 11:26 am
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Inserted full title
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 103 Nays 6
- Read a second time
- Returned to Senate
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
- Roll call # 330 yeas 28 nays 10 excused 0 not voting 0
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
- House inserted full title
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-4
- Substitute s-4 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-4
- Passed roll call # 242 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Amendment(s) adopted
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received on 06/11/2013
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on banking and financial institutions
- Introduced by senator randy richardville
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor